US HB3729 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Child Trafficking Victims Protection and Welfare Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Trafficking Victims Protection and Welfare Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-08-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB661 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects

Appropriations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback