US HB3727 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ITAM Act Increasing Telehealth Access in Medicare Act This bill allows Medicare Advantage organizations to include additional telehealth services as basic benefits in their annual bids beginning in plan year 2020. The bill also permits payment under Medicare for chronic care management services that use specified telecommunication technologies. The bill increases funding available to the Medicare Improvement Fund.
Title
ITAM Act Increasing Telehealth Access in Medicare Act
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355. |
2017-12-21 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2017-12-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-480, Part I. |
2017-09-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare