US HB3724 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Integrity in the IRS Workforce Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to prohibit the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) from rehiring any individual who was previously employed by the IRS but was removed for misconduct or whose employment was terminated for cause. (Sec. 3) No additional funds are authorized to carry out this bill.
Title
Ensuring Integrity in the IRS Workforce Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - On Passage (Y: 345 N: 78 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-21 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 345 - 78 (Roll no. 163). (text: CR H1900) |
2016-04-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1911-1912) |
2016-04-21 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3724, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote announced that the yeas had prevailed. Mrs. Noem demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the bill until later in the legislative day. |
2016-04-21 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1905) |
2016-04-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3724. |
2016-04-21 | House | Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 4890 and H.R. 3724. |
2016-04-21 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 688. (consideration: CR H1900-1905) |
2016-04-19 | House | Rule H. Res. 688 passed House. |
2016-04-18 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 688 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 4890 and H.R. 3724. |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 382. |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-500. |
2016-04-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2439 (Related) 2016-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR688 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR688 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Department of the Treasury
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation