US HB3708 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a taxpayer with a primary care service arrangement whose fixed periodic fee does not exceed $150 a month to participate in and contribute to a health savings account.
Title
Primary Care Enhancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-07-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E902-903) |
2019-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2999 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8417 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8417 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3708/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3708/BILLS-116hr3708ih.pdf |