US HB3703 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To facilitate the installation of broadband infrastructure, and for other purposes.
Title
Nationwide Dig Once Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1783 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB745 (Related) 2021-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB745 (Related) 2021-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3703/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3703/BILLS-117hr3703ih.pdf |