US HB370 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pipeline and LNG Facility Cybersecurity Preparedness Act This bill requires the Department of Energy to implement a program to ensure the security, resiliency, and survivability of natural gas pipelines, hazardous liquid pipelines, and liquefied natural gas facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pipeline and LNG Facility Cybersecurity Preparedness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-16HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-16HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB300 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback