US HB3686 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-638, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-638, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to provide for the establishment of a Ski Area Fee Retention Account, and for other purposes.
Title
Ski Hill Resources for Economic Development Act SHRED Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] |
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-638, Part I. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-13 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-06-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1964 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 253.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3686/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3686/BILLS-117hr3686ih.pdf |