US HB3670 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Short-Term Detention Standards Act This bill requires U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to make every effort to ensure that apprehended individuals are given access to appropriate temporary shelter, bathrooms and shower facilities, water, appropriate nutrition, hygiene, personal grooming items, and sanitation needs. Currently, CBP is only required to make every effort to provide food and water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short-Term Detention Standards Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-07-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7436)
2019-07-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7436-7438)
2019-07-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3670.
2019-07-25HouseMs. Slotkin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-07-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3731 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback