US HB367 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 127-59-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-110, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pay Our Coast Guard Parity Act of 2019 This bill provides continuing appropriations to the U.S. Coast Guard for any period during FY2019 in which interim or full-year appropriations for the Coast Guard are not in effect. The appropriations are provided to the Coast Guard for pay and allowances for members of the Coast Guard, civilian employees, and contractors; the payment of a death gratuity, funeral travel, and the temporary continuation of the basic allowance for housing for dependents of members of the Coast Guard dying on active duty; and retired pay. The appropriations are provided until the enactment of specified Coast Guard appropriations legislation. The bill compensates civilian Coast Guard employees furloughed as a result of a lapse in appropriations that began on or about December 22, 2018, and ended upon the enactment of this bill. The bill also ratifies and approves certain obligations incurred in anticipation of the appropriations made and the authority granted by this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pay Our Coast Guard Parity Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]
Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-110, Part I.
2019-03-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-03-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB350 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB421 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H665)
SB21 (Related) 2019-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 2. (text: CR S27)
HB374 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB3409 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback