US HB3669 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Weatherizing Infrastructure in the North and Terrorism Emergency Readiness Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security to develop and conduct a collective-response-to-terrorism exercise that includes managing cascading effects on critical infrastructure, such as an extreme cold-weather event caused by a polar vortex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weatherizing Infrastructure in the North and Terrorism Emergency Readiness Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-12-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9377)
2019-12-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3669.
2019-12-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9377-9378)
2019-12-09HouseMs. Slotkin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-11-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
2019-11-22HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-308.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-07-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback