US HB3661 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various Small Business Administration programs currently available to active duty members of the U.S. Armed Forces also available to those on full-time National Guard duty.
Title
Patriotic Employer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8800) |
2019-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3661. |
2019-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8800-8802) |
2019-11-13 | House | Mr. Schneider moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186. |
2019-10-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-234. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Commerce
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Government lending and loan guarantees
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Small business
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Government lending and loan guarantees
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Small business