US HB365 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To release the reversionary interest of the United States in certain non-Federal land in Salt Lake City, Utah, and for other purposes.
Title
To release the reversionary interest of the United States in certain non-Federal land in Salt Lake City, Utah, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1260 (Related) 2023-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 159.
HB5768 (Related) 2023-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB5768 (Related) 2023-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/365/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr365/BILLS-118hr365ih.pdf |