US HB3637 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-3)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Department of Health and Human Services to provide grants to accredited education programs to increase diversity in the physical-therapy, occupational-therapy, audiology, and speech-language pathology professions. Grants may be used to provide scholarships or to support recruitment and retention of students from underrepresented groups.
Title
Allied Health Workforce Diversity Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2781 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2747 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2747 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Higher education
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical education
Minority education
Health programs administration and funding
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Higher education
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical education
Minority education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3637/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3637/BILLS-116hr3637ih.pdf |