US HB3634 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to publish on its website, and periodically update, specified information related to federal expenditures under Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) in each of the U.S. territories.
Title
Medicaid and CHIP Territory Transparency and Information Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-07-09 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E882-883) |
2019-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1354 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1773 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1773 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Child health
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
U.S. territories and protectorates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3634/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3634/BILLS-116hr3634ih.pdf |