US HB3634 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SERVE Act of 2017 Securing Electronic Records for Veterans' Ease Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) furnish individuals receiving Post-9/11 educational assistance with documentation verifying the amount of the recipient's monthly housing stipend, and (2) make such documentation available using an Internet website in the same manner that the VA provides individuals with documentation verifying other compensation and benefits.
Title
SERVE Act of 2017 Securing Electronic Records for Veterans' Ease Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8560) |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3634. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8560-8561) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 292. |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-396. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-10-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-08-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2017-08-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-08-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2294 (Same As) 2018-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Government information and archives
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs