US HB3634 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student Loan Debt Protection Act of 2015 This bill amends the federal bankruptcy code to permit a borrower to discharge in bankruptcy a nonprofit, government, or private student loan, or an obligation to repay an educational benefit, scholarship, or stipend. It amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to reinstate the six-year statute of limitations on actions to recover on defaulted student loans. The bill prohibits collecting the amount owed on a defaulted federal student loan through: (1) offsets of social security, railroad retirement, or black lung benefits; (2) offsets of tax refunds; or (3) wage garnishment. It amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from an individual's gross income: (1) discharged student loan debt, and (2) income distributions from qualified tuition plans that are used to pay the interest or principal on student loans. The bill makes parent PLUS loans eligible for income-contingent repayment plans, including the Pay As You Earn repayment plan. Additionally, it makes parent PLUS loans and consolidation loans that repay parent PLUS loans eligible for income-based repayment plans and loan forgiveness for service in areas of national need. It prohibits: (1) evidence of an individual's default on a federal student loan from being used in a federal or state proceeding involving the individual's professional or vocational license, and (2) an institution of higher education from blocking access to a student's records due to federal student loan default. Finally, the bill modifies the public service loan forgiveness program to require the Department of Education to forgive 50% of the Direct loan balance for an eligible borrower who is employed in a public service job and makes 60 monthly payments after October 1, 2015.
Title
Student Loan Debt Protection Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2015-11-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1352 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Civil actions and liability
Debt collection
Education
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Income tax exclusion
Licensing and registrations
Student aid and college costs
Student records
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Wages and earnings
Civil actions and liability
Debt collection
Education
Evidence and witnesses
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Income tax exclusion
Licensing and registrations
Student aid and college costs
Student records
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3634/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3634/BILLS-114hr3634ih.pdf |