US HB3626 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bank Service Company Examination Coordination Act of 2017 This bill amends the Bank Service Company Act to require the coordination of state banking agencies with federal banking agencies in regulating and examining the activities of bank service companies. It also allows for the sharing of information related to examinations and regulations between federal and state agencies.
Title
Bank Service Company Examination Coordination Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 788. |
2018-11-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-1007. |
2018-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 0. |
2018-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
State and local government operations
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
State and local government operations