US HB362 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Secretary of Energy to assign energy emergency and energy security functions to an Assistant Secretary, including responsibilities with respect to infrastructure and cybersecurity. The Department of Energy must ensure that such functions are performed in coordination with relevant federal agencies.
Title
Energy Emergency Leadership Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4966) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 362. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4966-4968) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 203. |
2019-10-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-255. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Department of Energy
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Department of Energy
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations