US HB3614 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 107-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the availability and affordability of menstrual products for individuals with limited access, and for other purposes.
Title
Menstrual Equity For All Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-06-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E607) |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2478 (Related) 2021-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3614/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3614/BILLS-117hr3614ih.pdf |