US HB3608 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: House Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: House Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the ability of veterans to receive in-state tuition using educational assistance administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the ability of veterans to receive in-state tuition using educational assistance administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-07-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2136 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2830 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5278 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
SB2830 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5278 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3608/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3608/BILLS-116hr3608ih.pdf |