US HB3607 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Health Care Choice Act - Authorizes a state to limit the application of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) with respect to health insurance coverage within that state by enacting a law that: (1) expresses the intent of the state to opt out of one or more of the provisions of PPACA, (2) contains a list of the provisions that will not apply to the state, and (3) either expresses the state's intent to continue to administer health coverage-related laws as in effect in the state on March 23, 2010, or provides for the implementation of related state laws enacted after such date. Sets forth provisions that may be made inapplicable within a state, including provisions related to health coverage, essential health benefits, health insurance exchanges, alternative health plans established by states, individual and employer health coverage requirements, interoperable protocols for enrollment in federal and state health and human service programs, and expansion of Medicaid coverage.
Title
State Health Care Choice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1711 (Same As) 2013-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
State and local government operations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3607/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3607/BILLS-113hr3607ih.pdf |