US HB3597 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Solar Energy Research and Development Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of Energy to carry out a grant program to research, develop, and evaluate solar energy technologies and systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar Energy Research and Development Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 13.
2019-07-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-10HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 7 - 5 .
2019-07-10HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-06-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2668 (Related) 2019-11-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback