US HB3595 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strong Families Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) allow certain employers a business-related tax credit for a specified percentage (not to exceed 25%) of the amount of wages paid to their employees during any period (not exceeding 12 weeks) in which such employees are on family and medical leave, (2) limit the allowable amount of such credit with respect to any employee to the product of the normal hourly wage rate of such employee for each hour (or fraction thereof) of actual services performed for the employer and the number of hours (or fraction thereof) for which family and medical leave is taken, and (3) terminate such credit five years after the enactment of this bill. The Government Accountability Office shall complete a study on the effectiveness of the tax credit for paid family and medical leave.
Title
Strong Families Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB344 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1716 (Same As) 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3412 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1716 (Same As) 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3412 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee leave
Government studies and investigations
Income tax credits
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee leave
Government studies and investigations
Income tax credits
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3595/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3595/BILLS-115hr3595ih.pdf |