US HB3594 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-105. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-105. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Extension Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to extend the authority of institutions of higher education (IHEs) to disburse Federal Perkins Loans to new undergraduate borrowers through September 30, 2017. A student must first exhaust Federal Direct Subsidized and Unsubsidized Stafford Loan eligibility. IHEs may continue to disburse Perkins Loans to current undergraduate borrowers through September 30, 2017. A student must first exhaust all Federal Direct Subsidized Stafford Loan eligibility. IHEs may continue to disburse Perkins Loans to certain graduate borrowers through September 30, 2016, to enable students to continue or complete an academic program. A student must have received a Perkins loan prior to October 1, 2015. The bill prohibits Perkins Loan disbursement beyond September 30, 2017. It also prohibits authorization of additional appropriations for the Federal Perkins Loan program beyond September 30, 2016. Beginning October 1, 2017, each participating IHE must pay to the Department of Education: (1) a portion of the federal share of the balance of its Perkins Loan funds; (2) a portion of the Perkins student loan payments, including principal and interest, received by the institution; and (3) a capital distribution from its Perkins Loan fund. (Sec. 3) The bill also expands disclosure requirements for IHEs that participate in the Federal Perkins Loan program. Specifically, prior to Perkins Loan disbursement, an IHE must provide notice and explanation to all borrowers regarding unavailability of future Perkins loans, limited Perkins loan repayment and forgiveness options, and Direct Loan consolidation options. Also, an IHE must provide notice and explanation to new and current undergraduate borrowers regarding a comparison of Perkins and Direct loan interest rates.
Title
Higher Education Extension Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-105. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9676) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Mr. Bishop (MI) asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9676) |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2929 Amendment SA 2929 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2929 Amendment SA 2929 proposed by Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S8708; text: CR S8708) |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8708-8709) |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-09-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6279) |
2015-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3594. |
2015-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6279-6281) |
2015-09-28 | House | Mr. Bishop (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |