US HB3589 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 226-76)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-208. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 226-76)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-208. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a Congressional Gold Medal to Greg LeMond, in recognition of his contributions to the nation as an athlete, activist, role model, and community leader.
Title
Greg LeMond Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-208. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6693) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7814-7815) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3589. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7814-7816) |
2019-09-19 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-09 | House | Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. Thompson (CA). |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2570 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.