US HB3567 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the purchase of a small parcel of Natural Resources Conservation Service property in Riverside, California, by the Riverside Corona Resource Conservation District, and for other purposes. (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to sell a parcel of real property, including improvements, located at 4500 Glenwood Drive in Riverside, California, consisting of approximately 8.75 acres and administered by the Natural Resources Conservation Service, to the Riverside Corona Resource Conservation District for such property's appraised value. USDA and the district may survey such property to facilitate its purchase. USDA shall: (1) not reserve any future interest in such property except as may be acceptable to the district; and (2) be required to meet the disclosure requirements for, but shall not be required to remediate or abate any such releases of, hazardous substances, pollutants, or contaminants on such property. In conjunction with or in addition to the purchase of such property, USDA may enter into leases, contracts, and cooperative agreements with the district. USDA may lease real property from the district on a noncompetitive basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To authorize the purchase of a small parcel of Natural Resources Conservation Service property in Riverside, California, by the Riverside Corona Resource Conservation District, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-01SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
2017-10-31HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-10-31HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8283)
2017-10-31HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3567.
2017-10-31HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8283-8284)
2017-10-31HouseMr. Crawford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-10-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 272.
2017-10-26HouseReported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 115-372.
2017-10-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-10-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2017-07-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2017-07-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback