US HB3566 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit an alien who is not in a lawful immigration status in the United States from being eligible for postsecondary education benefits that are not available to all citizens and nationals of the United States. Amends the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to prohibit an alien who is not in a lawful immigration status from being eligible for any postsecondary education benefit unless every citizen and national of this country is eligible to receive that benefit in no less of an amount, duration, or scope. (This replaces a prohibition against a state's offering such aliens postsecondary benefits on the basis of their residence in the state that are more generous than those offered citizens or naturals of this country without regard to their state residence.) Allows any citizen or national who is enrolled at a postsecondary educational institution that is alleged to have violated that prohibition to bring a civil action against any state official overseeing the institution to obtain appropriate relief, attorneys' fees, and court costs.
Title
To prohibit an alien who is not in a lawful immigration status in the United States from being eligible for postsecondary education benefits that are not available to all citizens and nationals of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] |
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] |
Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2015-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-09-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB60 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Civil actions and liability
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Student aid and college costs
Civil actions and liability
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3566/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3566/BILLS-114hr3566ih.pdf |