US HB3553 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally prohibits and penalizes the manufacture, sale, transfer, purchase, or receipt of a ghost gun. A ghost gun is a firearm that lacks a unique serial number.
Title
Untraceable Firearms Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3743 (Related) 2020-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3743 (Related) 2020-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aviation and airports
Business records
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Transportation safety and security
Aviation and airports
Business records
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3553/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3553/BILLS-116hr3553ih.pdf |