US HB354 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security and Secretary of State to require aliens applying for certain visas to disclose if they receive funds from the Government of the People's Republic of China or the Chinese Communist Party, and for other purposes.
Title
CCP Visa Disclosure Act of 2021 Chinese Communist Party Visa Disclosure Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4792 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB7457 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB7457 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/354/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr354/BILLS-117hr354ih.pdf |