US HB3537 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the Boots to Business Program, which provides entrepreneurship training to individuals including veterans and active members of the Armed Forces, to be administered by the Small Business Administration.
Title
Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 612 (Y: 424 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 612). (text: CR H8797-8798) |
2019-11-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8812) |
2019-11-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3537. |
2019-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8797-8800) |
2019-11-13 | House | Mr. Schneider moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188. |
2019-10-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-236. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1998 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
Subjects
Business education
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Military personnel and dependents
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Military personnel and dependents
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation