US HB3535 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 18.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ruffey Rancheria Restoration Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ruffey Rancheria Restoration Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 18.
2018-05-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-05-08HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
2017-09-26HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-08-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-07-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-07-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback