US HB3523 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to set maximum prices for prescription drugs under specified federal health programs. Specifically, HHS must establish reference prices based on certain factors, including drug prices in listed countries. Retail prices of covered drugs under specified federal health programs (e.g., Medicare and Medicaid) may not exceed the established reference prices. Drugs must also be available at such prices to uninsured individuals and to individuals with private health insurance.
Title
End Price Gouging for Medications Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Reform, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Reform, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Reform, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Reform, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Reform, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Reform, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1987 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4569-4570)
Subjects
Asia
Australia
Canada
Civil actions and liability
Europe
France
Germany
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Inflation and prices
Italy
Japan
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Military medicine
Netherlands
North America
Oceania
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Spain
Sweden
Switzerland
United Kingdom
Veterans' medical care
Australia
Canada
Civil actions and liability
Europe
France
Germany
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Inflation and prices
Italy
Japan
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Military medicine
Netherlands
North America
Oceania
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Spain
Sweden
Switzerland
United Kingdom
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3523/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3523/BILLS-116hr3523ih.pdf |