US HB352 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental Protection Agency Accountability Act of 2015 This bill requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to satisfy within 30 days regulatory requirements concerning: improving planning and regulator review under Executive Order 13563, Executive Order 12866, or any successor executive order establishing requirements applicable to the uniform reporting of regulatory and deregulatory agendas; publishing in the Federal Register its regulatory flexibility agendas; certifying compliance with Executive Order 13132 when transmitting any draft final regulation or proposed legislation that has federalism implication to the Office of Management and Budget; and preparing statements to accompany significant regulatory actions. If the EPA fails to satisfy these requirements, financial penalties in the form of funding rescissions will be imposed on the EPA each week until all the requirements are satisfied. In any year in which funds are rescinded, the EPA Inspector General must conduct an audit to assess the EPA's compliance with this Act.
Title
Environmental Protection Agency Accountability Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB110 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/352/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr352/BILLS-114hr352ih.pdf |