US HB3510 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reform sentencing laws and correctional institutions, and for other purposes.
Title
First Step Implementation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Same As) 2021-07-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 98.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3510/BILLS-117hr3510ih.pdf |