US HB3504 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Ryan Kules Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ryan Kules Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-03-26SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-26SenateS.Amdt.1579 Amendment SA 1579 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-26SenateS.Amdt.1579 Amendment SA 1579 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S2158; text: CR S2156-2158) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-03-26SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2158)
2019-07-24SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-07-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7207-7209)
2019-07-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3504.
2019-07-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7207-7211)
2019-07-23HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 124.
2019-07-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-164.
2019-07-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-06-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2022 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2934 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB3535 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB3640 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB2265 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback