US HB350 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 205-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to H.R. 350 (Record Vote No. 210) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to H.R. 350 (Record Vote No. 210) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize dedicated domestic terrorism offices within the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Justice, and the Federal Bureau of Investigation to analyze and monitor domestic terrorist activity and require the Federal Government to take steps to prevent domestic terrorism.
Title
Domestic Terrorism Prevention Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to H.R. 350 (Record Vote No. 210) entered in Senate. (Y: 47 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - On passage (Y: 222 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - On passage (Y: 222 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to H.R. 350 (Record Vote No. 210) entered in Senate. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 47. Record Vote Number: 210. (CR S2721) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S2714) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S2647) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S2646-2647) |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (Legislative Day 5/17/2022). |
2022-05-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-18 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 203 (Roll no. 221). (text: CR H5143-5145) |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5166) |
2022-05-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bishop (NC) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-05-18 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-05-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 350. |
2022-05-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 350, H.R. 7688 and H.R. 7790. Provides for one of hour of general debate and one motion to recommit for each bill. Resolution also provides for en bloc suspension authority. |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1124. (consideration: CR H5143-5152) |
2022-05-17 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1124 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 350, H.R. 7688 and H.R. 7790. Provides for one of hour of general debate and one motion to recommit for each bill. Resolution also provides for en bloc suspension authority. |
2022-04-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 214. |
2022-04-21 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2022-04-21 | House | Committee on Homeland Security discharged. |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-292, Part I. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 17. |
2022-03-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-16 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB963 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
HR1124 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4255 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB964 (Related) 2021-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1773-1774)
HR1124 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4255 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB964 (Related) 2021-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1773-1774)