US HB35 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 148-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Emmett Till Antilynching Act This bill establishes a new criminal civil rights violation for lynching. Specifically, a person who conspires to commit certain civil rights offenses (e.g., a hate crime act) is subject to criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emmett Till Antilynching Act

Sponsors

Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]

Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 71 (Y: 410 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-02-26HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 4 (Roll no. 71). (text: CR H1197-1198)
2020-02-26HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1211-1212)
2020-02-26HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-02-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 35.
2020-02-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1197-1203)
2020-02-26HouseMr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-31HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 212.
2019-10-31HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-267.
2019-06-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3536 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB488 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB7120 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
SB3985 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 126) entered in Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback