US HB3495 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 159-95)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Improve Well-Being for Veterans Act This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to award grants for a period of three years to eligible entities for the provision of suicide prevention services to veterans and their families. Under the bill, eligible entities include tribally designated housing entities, community-based organizations, and other private entities that meet certain requirements. Entities must submit an application to receive financial assistance that includes a description of the services they propose to provide, among other elements. The bill requires the VA to equitably distribute grants across geographic regions and areas with the most need. Additionally, the VA shall give preference to entities that are experienced in providing suicide prevention services. Entities receiving funding must notify service recipients that funding is wholly or partially from the VA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improve Well-Being for Veterans Act

Sponsors

Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. George Holding [R-NC]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]
Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]
Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-05HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10.
2019-12-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-05HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
2019-07-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-06-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1906 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback