US HB3495 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 162-93)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to award grants for a period of three years to eligible entities for the provision of suicide prevention services to veterans and their families. Under the bill, eligible entities include tribally designated housing entities, community-based organizations, and other private entities that meet certain requirements. Entities must submit an application to receive financial assistance that includes a description of the services they propose to provide, among other elements. The bill requires the VA to equitably distribute grants across geographic regions and areas with the most need. Additionally, the VA shall give preference to entities that are experienced in providing suicide prevention services. Entities receiving funding must notify service recipients that funding is wholly or partially from the VA.
Title
Improve Well-Being for Veterans Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10. |
2019-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1906 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3495/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3495/BILLS-116hr3495ih.pdf |