US HB3491 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Kickapoo Tribe in Kansas Water Rights Settlement Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kickapoo Tribe in Kansas Water Rights Settlement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-06-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1977 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback