US HB3490 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits as a condition to a loan or extension of credit a confession of judgment or similar agreement. (A confession of judgment is an agreement to a judgment of liability without notice and opportunity to be heard in court in the event of the default of a borrower.)
Title
Small Business Lending Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 336. |
2020-03-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-417. |
2019-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 23. |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1961 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Business ethics
Consumer credit
Contracts and agency
Finance and financial sector
Lawyers and legal services
Consumer credit
Contracts and agency
Finance and financial sector
Lawyers and legal services