US HB3485 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes visa-blocking sanctions on foreign persons responsible for or complicit in violating the human rights of individuals due to actual or perceived sexual orientation, gender identity, or sex characteristics. The President shall report and periodically update a list of foreign persons responsible for such human rights violations and apply sanctions accordingly. The Department of State shall designate at least one senior officer who shall be responsible for tracking violence and discrimination against individuals based on actual or perceived sexual orientation, gender identity, or sex characteristics in foreign countries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global Respect Act

Sponsors

Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-09-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2277 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3800 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1996 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback