US HB3475 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Became Public Law No: 117-56.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Became Public Law No: 117-56.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Columbus, Georgia, as the Robert S. Poydasheff VA Clinic.
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Columbus, Georgia, as the Robert S. Poydasheff VA Clinic.
Sponsors
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA] | Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-12 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-56. |
2021-11-12 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-11-03 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7450) |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4541) |
2021-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3475. |
2021-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4541-4543) |
2021-09-20 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1803 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.