US HB3471 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the continued use of power from the Pick-Sloan Missouri Basin Program by the Kinsey Irrigation Company and the Sidney Water Users Irrigation District in Montana.
Title
To make available the continued use of Pick-Sloan Missouri Basin Program project use power by the Kinsey Irrigation Company and the Sidney Water Users Irrigation District, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1882 (Same As) 2019-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 310.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Montana
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Montana
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3471/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3471/BILLS-116hr3471ih.pdf |