US HB347 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through FY2031 authorization for the Department of Energy to operate the Cheney disposal cell in Mesa County, Colorado. (The disposal cell serves as a repository for mill tailings, which is sandy waste that results from the process of turning natural uranium into fuel.)
Title
Responsible Disposal Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-98. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2329) |
2019-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 347. |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2329-2330) |
2019-03-05 | House | Mr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.