US HB3469 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the bridge located in Blount County, Tennessee, on the Foothills Parkway (commonly known as "Bridge 2") as the "Dean Stone Bridge". (Sec. 1) This bill designates the bridge located in Blount County, Tennessee, on the Foothills Parkway (commonly known as Bridge 2) as the "Dean Stone Bridge."
Title
To designate the bridge located in Blount County, Tennessee, on the Foothills Parkway (commonly known as "Bridge 2") as the "Dean Stone Bridge".
Sponsors
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1517) |
2018-03-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3469. |
2018-03-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1517-1518) |
2018-03-13 | House | Mr. Curtis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-11-21 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 103. |
2017-11-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-421. |
2017-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-08 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-08-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |