US HB3459 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 115-3)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 272.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 272.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Local Business Opportunity Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Labor Relations Act to allow two or more employers to be considered joint employers for purposes of the Act only if each employer shares and exercises control over essential terms and conditions of employment and such control over these matters is actual, direct, and immediate.
Title
Protecting Local Business Opportunity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 272. |
2015-12-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-355. |
2015-10-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15. |
2015-10-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-09-29 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Prior to Referral. |
2015-09-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-09-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2015 (Same As) 2015-09-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2686 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB2686 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.