US HB3449 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to extend honorary citizenship to otherwise qualified noncitizens who enlisted in the Philippines and died while serving on active duty with the United States Armed Forces during certain periods of hostilities, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to extend posthumous citizenship to an otherwise qualified noncitizen who enlisted, reenlisted, extended enlistment, or was inducted into the U.S. Armed Forces in the Philippines and died as a result of such active duty service during the period September 1, 1939-December 31, 1946. The executive department under which a person served shall determine whether the person satisfied the requirements for posthumous citizenship. Specified naturalization and other posthumous benefit provisions shall not apply to the surviving spouse, child, or parent of such a person.
Title
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to extend honorary citizenship to otherwise qualified noncitizens who enlisted in the Philippines and died while serving on active duty with the United States Armed Forces during certain periods of hostilities, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-09-16 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged. |
2015-09-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-09-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
Citizenship and naturalization
Conflicts and wars
Immigration
Military personnel and dependents
Philippines
Citizenship and naturalization
Conflicts and wars
Immigration
Military personnel and dependents
Philippines
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3449/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3449/BILLS-114hr3449ih.pdf |