US HB3439 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2026 the Patient-Centered Outcomes Research Trust Fund, which supports research that evaluates and compares outcomes and the clinical effectiveness, risks, and benefits of two or more medical treatments, services, or other health practices. The bill also requires that research supported by the trust prioritize substance use disorders (including opioid use), mental health, and maternal health. Additionally, the bill extends specified fees on private health insurance plans, including self-insured plans, which support the trust.
Title
PATIENTS Act Protecting Access To Information for Effective & Necessary Treatment and Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 579. |
2020-12-24 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-12-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-696, Part I. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 15. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3030 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Appropriations
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Mental health
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
Women's health
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Mental health
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
Women's health