US HB3413 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

DHS Acquisition Reform Act of 2019 This bill revises acquisition and procurement programs and activities of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The bill (1) designates the DHS Under Secretary for Management as the DHS Chief Acquisition Officer and sets forth the Under Secretary's acquisition-related duties, (2) sets forth new acquisition responsibilities of the DHS Chief Financial Officer and the DHS Chief Information Officer, and (3) establishes within the Management Directorate of DHS a Program Accountability and Risk Management office and sets forth the responsibilities of its Executive Director. The DHS Under Secretary for Strategy, Policy, and Plans must ensure that acquisition programs support the DHS Quadrennial Homeland Security Review Report, the DHS Strategic Plan, the DHS Strategic Priorities, and other appropriate successor documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS Acquisition Reform Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 56 (Y: 380 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 380 - 4 (Roll no. 56). (text: CR H995-997)
2020-02-10HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1000)
2020-02-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-02-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3413.
2020-02-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H995-997)
2020-02-10HouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-08-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 148.
2019-08-30HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-190.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-17HouseSubcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged.
2019-07-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
2019-06-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-06-21HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback